This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 01:58:04 (UTC).

ALICE KUAN VS. GRACE HUANG, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 ALICE KUAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against GRACE HUANG,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6480

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUAN ALICE

Defendants

HUANG GRACE

GUO GUIZHI

HUANG JIHUI

LEE GEOFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAMICO NICHOLAS L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/15/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTWE RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS D?A

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTWE RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS D?A

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JIHUI HUANG)

7/30/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JIHUI HUANG)

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (GRACE HUANG)

7/30/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (GRACE HUANG)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ATTORNEY'S CERTFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (GUIZHI GUO)

7/30/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (GUIZHI GUO)

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (GUIZHI GUO)

7/30/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (GUIZHI GUO)

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (GRACE HUANG)

7/30/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (GRACE HUANG)

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVIC BY MAIL FOR PLALNTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (JIHUI HUANG)

7/30/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVIC BY MAIL FOR PLALNTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (JIHUI HUANG)

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/4/2018: Minute Order

VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

9/5/2018: VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/7/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/7/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/7/2018: ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by Alice Kuan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Alice Kuan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Alice Kuan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default; Case Management C...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alice Kuan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Alice Kuan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD RECLASSIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6480    Hearing Date: November 05, 2020    Dept: 73

11/5/2020

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

ALICE KUAN v. GRACE HUANG, et al. (****6480)

Counsel for Plaintiff/moving party: Nicholas D’Amico

Counsel for Defendant/opposing party: Nigel Burns, Nicholas Stahl (Law Offices of Nigel Burns)

PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENCE, OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS (filed 9/28/2020)

TENTATIVE RULING

None.  The court continues the hearing to 12/8/20 and requests courtesy copies of the parties' pleadings for this motion and the demurrer set on 12/8/20.  Copies pertaining to this motion  shall be delivered to Dept. 73 within 5 days. Copies of the demurrer papers shall be provided within that timeframe, but in no event later than 5 court days before the hearing.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'AMICO NICHOLAS LUCIANO