This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 15:46:37 (UTC).

ALICE KELLY VS GARFIELD BEACH CVS, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 ALICE KELLY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GARFIELD BEACH CVS, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2529

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY ALICE

Defendants

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION

CVS PHARMACY INC.

DREBSKAYA ALEXIS

GARFIELD BEACH CVS LLC.

YERZY CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAVALA ROBERT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alice Kelly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice Kelly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alice Kelly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice Kelly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARFIELD BEACH CVS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant