This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:09:24 (UTC).

ALICE JUNG VS JAMES J. ARMSTRONG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 ALICE JUNG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES J ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6648

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNG ALICE

Defendants

ARMSTRONG JAMES J.

WALTON LAW GROUP P.C. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ARMSTRON & ARMSTRONG

A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ATTORNEYS AT LAW

ARMSTRONG & ARMSTRONG ATTORNEYS AT LAW A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

WALTON LAW GROUP P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS ANDREW JAMES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/29/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/18/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Related Case

12/13/2018: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/22/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration

1/24/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/24/2019: Declaration

Notice of Settlement

3/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

3/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/9/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

4/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by James J. Armstrong (Defendant); Armstrong & Armstrong, Attorneys at Law, A Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice, entire action); Filed by Alice Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by James J. Armstrong (Defendant); Armstrong & Armstrong, Attorneys at Law, A Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alice Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alice Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Tommy Q. Gallardo Pursuant to code of civil procedure sections 430.41 and 435.5 for automatic 30-day extension to respond to First Amended Complaint); Filed by James J. Armstrong (Defendant); Armstrong & Armstrong, Attorneys at Law, A Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Tommy Q. Gallardo Pursuant to code of civil procedure sections 430.41 and 435.5 for automatic 30-day extension to respond to first amended complaint); Filed by James J. Armstrong (Defendant); Armstrong & Armstrong, Attorneys at Law, A Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Alice Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alice Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMSTRONG & ARMSTRONG is a litigant

Latest cases where WALTON LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ANDREW J.