Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2020 at 11:26:40 (UTC).

ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST VS TERENCE BUTLER

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM TRUST filed an Other lawsuit against TERENCE BUTLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1348

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALICE GEVORKYAN TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST

Defendant

BUTLER TERENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Application for Writ of Possession

11/14/2019: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (TERENCE BUTLER)

9/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (TERENCE BUTLER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/17/2020

1/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/17/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/15/2019: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

11/12/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO CCP 1169

11/12/2019: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO CCP 1169

Application for Order to Post

10/16/2019: Application for Order to Post

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/12/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Posting

11/12/2019: Proof of Service by Posting

Request for Dismissal

1/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MGMT CONF); Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketWrit of (Possession); Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAffidavit (Pursuant To CCP 1169); Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((TERENCE BUTLER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALICE GEVORKYAN, TRUSTEE OF THE SHILBEVORKYAN FAM. TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less