This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 11:44:33 (UTC).

ALICE BUTLER, ET AL. VS JUUL LABS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On February 10, 2021, Alice Butler, Madison Rowe, Reece Pearson, Cody Capron, Dylan Romano and others (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Mark P. Robinson Jr, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc., previously d/b/a as PAX Labs, Inc. and Ploom Inc. (“JLI”) James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh and others (collectively, “Defendants”) seeking injunctive relief, restitution, and damages for failing to disclose a known defect and affirmatively misrepresenting that JUUL e-cigarettes and pods are safe for their intended use in their advertising leading to physical injuries and and continuing likelihood of medical problems to the Plaintiffs. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court in the Spring Street Courthouse with Judge Ann I. Jones presiding

In their complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that “JLI advertises its e-cigarettes and pods deliberately to attract the minors and young adults, including those who have never ever been regular tobacco smokers. In June of 2015, JLI launched the “vapourised” advertising campaign. Applying the template for praying on teens established by the cigarette industry, the Vapourised campaign used stylish models, bold colours, and highlighted themes of sexual attractiveness, thinness, independence, rebelliousness, and being “cool”. Robert Jackler, Stanford physician who investigated JLI’s launch campaign concluded that JLI’s “launch campaign was patently youth oriented.”

Plaintiffs further alleged that “JLI, JLI MANAGEMENT and ALTRIA knowingly agreed, contrived, combined, confederated and conspired among themselves to cause injuries, diseases and/or illnesses by exposing consumers and Plaintiffs to the harmful and dangerous JUUL e-cigarettes and pod products. JLI, JLI MANAGEMENT and ALTRIA knowingly agreed, contrived, confederated and conspired to deprive Plaintiffs of the opportunity of informed free choice as to whether to use the JUUL e-cigarette and pod products or to expose themselves to the dangers associated with them. JLI, JLI MANAGEMENT and ALTRIA committed the above described wrongs by working in concert to maintain and expand the number of nicotine-addicted e-cigarette users to ensure a steady and growing customer base and wilfully misrepresenting and suppressing the truths as to the risks and dangers associated with the use of JUUL e-cigarette and pod products.” 

There are twelve causes of action laid down by the Plaintiffs. The first, second, third, seventh, eighth, ninth and tenth causes of action have been laid down against JLI Defendants and Altrea and DOES 1 through 100 for strict product liability - design defect, strict product liability - failure to warn, negligence and/or gross negligence, fraudulent concealment, fraud, violation of the Unfair Competition Law (“UCL”), Bus.& Prof. Code §§ 17200 et seq. and § 17500 respectively. The fourth, fifth and sixth claims were laid down against 

JLI Defendants and DOES 1 through 100 for negligent failure to recall, fraudulent misrepresentation and negligent misrepresentation respectively. The eleventh claim against JLI Defendants is for breach of implied warranty and merchantability and the twelfth claim against JLI Management and Altrea is for aiding and abetting. 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the court to pass an  order for an injunctive relief and restitution and to award past and future general damages, economic and special damages, loss of earnings and impaired earning capacities, medical expenses,  past and future and punitive and exemplary damages with prejudgment interest in addition to costs of litigation.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5703

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUTLER ALICE

RUSSO MATTHEW

PEARSON REECE

CAPRON CODY

SENIBALDI MICHAEL

ROWE MADISON

ROMANO DYLAN

ALLAIRE ALEXANDER

MOORE DAMIAN

DRAKE NALIAH

Defendants

JUUL LABS INC.

HUH HOYOUNG

BOWEN ADAM

ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC

VALANI RIAZ

ALTRIA GROUP INC.

MONSEES JAMES

PRITZKER NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON MARK PARKER JR

 

Court Documents

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER RE: FIFTH AMENDMENT/PLAINTIFF FACT ...)

9/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER RE: FIFTH AMENDMENT/PLAINTIFF FACT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUC...)

7/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUC...)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/4/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/4/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/4/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINT...)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINT...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL...)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL...)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL...)

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH ...)

1/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

3/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

40 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • Hearing10/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 11; Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 11; Hearing on Motion - Other (ReFifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact Sheets) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Re: Fifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Madison Rowe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Naliah Drake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Alice Butler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 11; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 11; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Convert the Court's April 14, 2022 Order Granting JLI's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice to an Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to CMO 11) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:55 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 02/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alice Butler (Plaintiff); Madison Rowe (Plaintiff); Reece Pearson (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alice Butler (Plaintiff); Madison Rowe (Plaintiff); Reece Pearson (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Altria Client Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINSON MARK P. JR