This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 13:58:58 (UTC).

ALICE AOTO VS GAIL WATANABE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2017 ALICE AOTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GAIL WATANABE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6617

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AOTO ALICE

Defendants and Respondents

WATANABE GAIL

TAKIS GEORGE

KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC.

KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NOJIMA JOHN ESQ.

JOHN NOJIMA ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ESHELMAN CAREY J.

MARTHA RICHARD H.

LORIN D. SNYDER ESQ.

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

MANNING MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/16/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/10/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

7/20/2017: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/28/2017: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/10/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

2/1/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/1/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

2/21/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

5/17/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/17/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/17/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

2/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

3/5/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/15/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice

4/10/2019: Notice

Declaration

4/17/2019: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/17/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice (of non-opposition to defendant/cross-complainants' motion and motion to continue trial and related dates); Filed by D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. (Legacy Party); D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. dba KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY Erroneously Sued As KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by GEORGE TAKIS (Defendant); D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. dba KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY Erroneously Sued As KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by GEORGE TAKIS (Defendant); D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. dba KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY Erroneously Sued As KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Declaration (of Erin E. Schroeder in Support of Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by GEORGE TAKIS (Defendant); D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. dba KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY Erroneously Sued As KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by GEORGE TAKIS (Defendant); D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. dba KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY Erroneously Sued As KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Declaration ( of Angela M. Hampton in Support of Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by GEORGE TAKIS (Defendant); D?AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. dba KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY Erroneously Sued As KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Service (BY MAIL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ALICE AOTO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES is a litigant

Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOJIMA JOHN