This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 08:49:38 (UTC).

ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR VS MASOUD MARAFEE

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MASOUD MARAFEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAUL A. BACIGALUPO, BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA, SHIRLEY K. WATKINS and VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0048

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PAUL A. BACIGALUPO

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAVANGARRANJBAR ALI

Defendant

MARAFEE MASOUD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAJD FARBOOD

MCMAHON BRIAN D.

Defendant Attorney

TABATABAI FARZAD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/9/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

8/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/1/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/1/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/27/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service by Mail

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/01/2022

3/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/01/2022

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 04/25/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department B, Paul A. Bacigalupo, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of 03/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketBrief (Plaintiffs Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief); Filed by ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (RE: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 Reassignment)) of 04/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order (RE: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 Reassignment))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by MASOUD MARAFEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by MASOUD MARAFEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALI TAVANGARRANJBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMAHON BRIAN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAJD FARBOOD