This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 01:04:18

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 a Labor - Wrongful Termination case was filed by ALI REZA JAZIREHI against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX8218
  • Filing Date 06/05/2018
  • Case Status Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type Labor - Wrongful Termination
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant ECONOMOU JAMES
  • Represented By
    • RONK STEPHEN E. ESQ.
  • Respondent HIATT JONATHAN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent ECONOMOU JAMES
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent DOES 1-20
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant BLOCK GENE D.
  • Represented By
    • RONK STEPHEN E. ESQ.
  • Defendant DOES 1-20
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent BLOCK GENE D.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant REGENETS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent REGENETS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner JAZIREHI ALI REZA
  • Represented By
    • LUBIN LEE D. ESQ.

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/5/2018: SUMMONS

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/29/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/15/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Fees Apply
Minute Order

8/1/2018: Minute Order

Fees Apply
DEFENDANTS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, JAME...

8/14/2018: DEFENDANTS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIF...

Fees Apply
DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S PREE...

7/31/2018: DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFO...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION OF NICOLE T. LOMIBAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TH...

8/14/2018: DECLARATION OF NICOLE T. LOMIBAO IN SUPPORT OF DE...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated
  • 09/24/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 15; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Order of Dismissal) -
  • 08/29/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 08/29/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 08/14/2018
  • Demurrer; Filed by Regents Of The University Of California (Legacy Party); University Of California Los Angeles (Legacy Party); James Economou (Defendant) et al.
  • 08/14/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NICOLE T. LOMIBAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, JAMES ECONOMOU, JONATHAN HIATT AND GENE D. BLOCK'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
  • 08/14/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Regents Of The University Of California (Legacy Party); University Of California Los Angeles (Legacy Party); James Economou (Defendant) et al.
  • 08/14/2018
  • DEFENDANTS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, JAMES ECONOMOU, JONATHAN HIATT AND GENE D. BLOCK'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
  • 08/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -
  • 08/01/2018
  • Minute Order
  • 07/31/2018
  • DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S PREEMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 170.6; ETC.
  • 07/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL
  • 07/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL
  • 07/30/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ali Reza Jazirehi (Plaintiff)
  • 07/30/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ali Reza Jazirehi (Plaintiff)
  • 07/30/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ali Reza Jazirehi (Plaintiff)
  • 07/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL
  • 06/27/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
  • 06/27/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons
  • 06/27/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.