This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 09:37:59 (UTC).

ALI DIBAEI VS CLASSIC MOTOR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 ALI DIBAEI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CLASSIC MOTOR, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1071

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

DIBAEI ALI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CLASSIC MOTOR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA INC. A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MANNING KIMBERLY

Defendant Attorney

ANYIA ALFRED O.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

11/12/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/10/2021: Answer

Answer

11/10/2021: Answer

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/30/2021: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ali Dibaei (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Classic Motor, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); The Guarantee Company of North America, Inc., a Michigan corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ali Dibaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Classic Motor, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Classic Motor, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Guarantee Company of North America, Inc., a Michigan corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ali Dibaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ali Dibaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ali Dibaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ali Dibaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ali Dibaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Classic Motor Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANNING KIMBERLY