This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 06:14:44 (UTC).

ALGO FIRST GROUP LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 ALGO FIRST GROUP LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0470

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALGO FIRST GROUP LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/30/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Algo First Group LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Algo First Group LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Algo First Group LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLONZ ADAM M.