This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2023 at 04:38:35 (UTC).

ALFREDO PEREZ VS ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 ALFREDO PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7157

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ ALFREDO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PCCP IRG DOWNEY LLC

INDUSTRIAL REALTY GROUP LLC

IRG DOWNEY LLC

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS (DOE 1)

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS DOE 1

LYLE PARKS JR. INC..

ALBERTA TIERRA LUNA MANAGEMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

LYLE PARKS JR INC

LYLE PARKS JR. INC.

Cross Defendants

CONSTRUCTORS COMMAND PERFORMANCE

SIMETA SIAKIMATIVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIORE MAURO JR. JR.

FIORE MAURO JR. LAW OFFICES OF

PUCHE SERGIO JULIAN

Defendant Attorneys

VANIS RICHARD W. JR. ESQ.

MOKRI VANIS & JONES

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/14/2020: Case Management Statement

SUMMONS -

2/7/2018: SUMMONS -

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF IRG DOWNEY, LLC FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNIFY 3. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE; ETC

2/1/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF IRG DOWNEY, LLC FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNIFY 3. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE; ETC

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PCCP IRG DOWNEY,LLC FOR: 1.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNITY 3BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE.ETC

2/1/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PCCP IRG DOWNEY,LLC FOR: 1.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNITY 3BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE.ETC

PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Summons on Cross Complaint -

2/7/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

Summons on Cross Complaint -

2/26/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LYLE PARKS JR, INC., FOR:

2/26/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LYLE PARKS JR, INC., FOR:

LYLE PARKS JR. INC. ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/26/2018: LYLE PARKS JR. INC. ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/20/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/20/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

3/23/2018: Minute Order -

Stipulation and Order -

7/6/2018: Stipulation and Order -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Elaine Lu 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Alberta Tierra Luna Management, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC to Alberta Tierra Luna Management, LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC to PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- LYLE PARKS JR, INC (Legacy Party): Organization Name changed from LYLE PARKS JR, INC to LYLE PARKS JR, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- LYLE PARKS JR., INC. (Cross-Complainant): Organization Name changed from LYLE PARKS JR., INC. to LYLE PARKS JR., INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- LYLE PARKS, JR., INC.. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from LYLE PARKS, JR., INC.. to LYLE PARKS, JR., INC..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTION (DOE 1) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTION (DOE 1) to COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTION (DOE 1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- SIMETA, SIAKIMATIVA: Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ALFREDO PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ALFREDO PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less