This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 05:28:17 (UTC).

ALFREDO PEREZ VS ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 ALFREDO PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7157

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ ALFREDO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PCCP IRG DOWNEY LLC

INDUSTRIAL REALTY GROUP LLC

LYLE PARKS JR INC

IRG DOWNEY LLC

ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS (DOE 1)

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS DOE 1

LYLE PARKS JR. INC..

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTION DOE 1

LYLE PARKS JR. INC.

Cross Defendants

CONSTRUCTORS; COMMAND PERFORMANCE

CONSTRUCTORS COMMAND PERFORMANCE

SIMETA SIAKIMATIVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIORE MAURO JR. ESQ.

FIORE MAURO JR. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

VANIS RICHARD W. JR. ESQ.

MOKRI VANIS & JONES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/7/2018: SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF IRG DOWNEY, LLC FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNIFY 3. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE; ETC

2/1/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF IRG DOWNEY, LLC FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNIFY 3. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE; ETC

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PCCP IRG DOWNEY,LLC FOR: 1.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNITY 3BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE.ETC

2/1/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PCCP IRG DOWNEY,LLC FOR: 1.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT 2.BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO INDEMNITY 3BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT TO OBTAIN INSURANCE.ETC

PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

2/7/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/26/2018: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LYLE PARKS JR, INC., FOR:

2/26/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LYLE PARKS JR, INC., FOR:

LYLE PARKS JR. INC. ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/26/2018: LYLE PARKS JR. INC. ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/20/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

7/6/2018: Stipulation and Order

SUMMONS

9/25/2017: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES COUNTS 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY;

9/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES COUNTS 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY;

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CORRECT THE NAME OF DEFENDANT/ CROSS-COMPLAINANT ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC TO ALBERTA TIERRA LUNA MANAGEMENT, LLC; ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by LYLE PARKS JR., INC. (Cross-Complainant); ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES POSTED BY PLAINTIFF 00 $150. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ALFREDO PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by ALFREDO PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by IRG DOWNEY, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketPCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by ALFREDO PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES COUNTS 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALFREDO PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less