This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:31:45 (UTC).

ALFRED O. ANYIA VS. VALENTINA ABELIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 ALFRED O ANYIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VALENTINA ABELIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN, LAURA A. MATZ and DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7611

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

LAURA A. MATZ

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANYIA ALFRED O.

Defendants

SINANIAN TOM

DOE NICK

SLS AUTO SALES

ABELIAN VALENTINA AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHN DOE 1

ABELIAN VALENTINA

DOE JOHN 1

MOURADYAN NAREK

MURADYAN VARGES

ABELIAN VALENTINA DBA SLS AUTO SALES

Not Classified By Court and Defendant

SLS AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTIAN ORONSAYE ESQ.

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN IGHEGHA

Defendant Attorneys

LAW DANIELYAN

DANIELYAN AREN HENRY

DANIELYAN LAW

WILSON DENNIS PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/21/2021

10/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/21/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN ORONSAYE IN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (OSC) RE MONETARY SANCTION FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING OF 10/21/2021.

10/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN ORONSAYE IN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (OSC) RE MONETARY SANCTION FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING OF 10/21/2021.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN ORONSAYE IN RE: MEET AND CONFER IN CONNECTION WITH THE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS- TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

11/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN ORONSAYE IN RE: MEET AND CONFER IN CONNECTION WITH THE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS- TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

11/22/2021: Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 583 FOR...)

11/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 583 FOR...)

Answer

12/6/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

12/6/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

12/9/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

12/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; TRIAL SETTI...)

12/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; TRIAL SETTI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/30/2021

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/16/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/17/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/17/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Post-Settlement Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default/Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default/Default Judgment; Trial Setti...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by ALFRED O. ANYIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ALFRED O. ANYIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ALFRED O. ANYIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Narek Mouradyan (Defendant); Varges Muradyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketRequest (FOR COPIES OF COMPLAINT & CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- 15 PAGES ); Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALFRED O. ANYIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7611    Hearing Date: May 21, 2021    Dept: E

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

[CCP ;284, CRC 3.1362]

Date: 5/21/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Alfred O. Anyia v. Valentina Abelian, et al. (****7611)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Counsel Aren Danielyan, Esq. of Danielyan Law’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for defendant Valentina Abelian dba SLS Auto Sales is GRANTED. The Court will sign the proposed Order lodged on April 9, 2021 and counsel will be relieved effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the signed order upon the client.



Case Number: ****7611    Hearing Date: April 9, 2021    Dept: E

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

[CCP ;284, CRC 3.1362]

Date: 4/9/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Alfred O. Anyia v. Valentina Abelian, et al. (****7611)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Counsel Aren Danielyan, Esq. of Danielyan Law’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for defendant Valentina Abelian dba SLS Auto Sales is DENIED.

Based on the hearing date of April 9, 2021, the deadline to serve this motion on defendant Abelian and plaintiff by overnight courier or email was March 15, 2021. (CCP ; 1005(b) [motion must be served and filed at least 16 court days prior to hearing]; 1010.6(a)(4)(B) [two court days added for email]; 1013(c) [two court days added for express mail].) The motion was untimely served on March 16, 2021. The Court notes that March 31, 2021 was a court holiday.

In addition, the proof of service states that only the motion was served, not the supporting declaration or proposed order.

Further, as a substantive matter, counsel seeks withdrawal due to “irreconcilable differences.” (Danielyan Decl. ¶ 2.) Counsel is required to state a cognizable ground for permissive withdrawal under California Rule of Professional Conduct 1.16(b).



Case Number: ****7611    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO FIRST

AMENDED COMPLAINT

Date: 12/20/19                                             

Case: Alfred O. Anyia v. Valentina Abelian, et al. (EC 067611)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Alfred O. Anyia’s Motion for Leave to File Amendment to First Amended Complaint Substituting the True Names for the Incorrect Names of Narek Mouradyan (Erroneously Sued as Nick Doe) and Varges Muradyan aka Varges Mouradyan (Erroneously Sued as John Doe 1) is DENIED.

Pursuant to Plaintiff’s previous requests on April 2, 2019, the operative complaint was amended to substitute the true name of Narek Mouradyan for the fictious name of Nick Doe and to substitute the true name of Varges Mouradyan for John Doe 1. [See Ex. C]. On August 21, 2019, the Court ordered the within action dismissed without prejudice as to Narek Mouradyan and Varges Muradyan. There are accordingly no parties remaining in this action with the names Nick Doe or John Doe 1 from whom plaintiff may obtain orders to correct.

Request for sanctions in opposition is denied.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN I