This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 10:11:38 (UTC).

ALFRED HERNANDEZ VS BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 ALFRED HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1099

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ ALFRED

Defendant

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY AKA BURLINGTON NORTHERN SANTA FE CORPORATION AKA BURLINGTON NORTHERN AND SANTA FE RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENTHAL DEBORAH

EDELSON JOSHUA A.

GIANARIS TED N.

Defendant Attorney

GREEN KRISTEN A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

1/17/2023: Notice - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/17/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING TED N. GIANARIS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TED N. GIANARIS; AND DECLA

1/26/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING TED N. GIANARIS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TED N. GIANARIS; AND DECLA

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING JOSHUA A. EDELSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JOSHUA A. EDELSON; DECLA

1/26/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING JOSHUA A. EDELSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JOSHUA A. EDELSON; DECLA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING CASE

2/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING CASE

Answer - DEFENDANT BNSF RAILWAY COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/16/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT BNSF RAILWAY COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING TED N. GIANARIS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

2/23/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING TED N. GIANARIS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING JOSHUA A. EDELSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

2/23/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING JOSHUA A. EDELSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITT...)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITT...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING TED N. GIANARIS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

2/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING TED N. GIANARIS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING JOSHUA A. EDELSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

2/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING JOSHUA A. EDELSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/13/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiffs Application for an Order Admitting Joshua A. Edelson to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiffs Application for an Order Admitting Ted N. Gianaris to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Plaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Joshua A. Edelson to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Signed and Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Plaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Ted N. Gianaris to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Signed and Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Ted N. Gianaris to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice: Filed By: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date changed from 02/23/2023 to 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Joshua A. Edelson to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice: Filed By: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date changed from 02/23/2023 to 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other on Plaintiffs Application for an Order Admitt...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kristen A. Green (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDefendant BNSF Railway Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint; Filed by: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant); As to: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Plaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Ted N. Gianaris to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Verified Application of Ted N. Gianaris; and Declaration of Crystal G. Foley; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Plaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Joshua A. Edelson to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Verified Application of Joshua A. Edelson; Declaration of Crystal G. Foley; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/20/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alfred Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less