This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 15:20:51 (UTC).

ALFRED DELEON VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 ALFRED DELEON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5422

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELEON ALFRED

Defendants

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MANAGER MONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2024
  • Hearing07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALFRED DELEON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALFRED DELEON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALFRED DELEON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW