This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 16:47:52 (UTC).

ALFRED AGUILERA VS KLASSIC ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 ALFRED AGUILERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KLASSIC ENGINEERING CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3015

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILERA ALFRED

Defendants

CITY OF LONG BEACH

KLASSIC ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACOUR JONATHAN PIERRE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/21/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2024
  • Hearing06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALFRED AGUILERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALFRED AGUILERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALFRED AGUILERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KLASSIC ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LACOUR JONATHAN PIERRE