This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2022 at 04:05:19 (UTC).

ALFONSO RAMOS VS CHRISTINA CUEVAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 ALFONSO RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTINA CUEVAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4192

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS ALFONSO

Cross Defendants and Defendants

CUEVAS CHRISTINA

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS INC.

MARTIN TRACY

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS INC.

MARTIN TRACY

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

RUGH CAROL

PRICE VIRGINIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PRICE VIRGINIA

Other Attorneys

RABINEAU LARRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

3/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

3/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/3/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/7/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

4/1/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

4/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/25/2021: PI General Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alfonso Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alfonso Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED); Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Tracy Martin (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Tracy Martin (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christina Cuevas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christina Cuevas (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Christina Cuevas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Alfonso Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); Tracy Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); Tracy Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); Tracy Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); Tracy Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alfonso Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alfonso Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alfonso Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant