Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2019 at 12:51:34 (UTC).

ALFONSO COBIAN VS KIA MOTORS, INC., A, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 ALFONSO COBIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIA MOTORS, INC , A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5981

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COBIAN ALFONSO

Defendants

LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC DBA KIA OF CERRITOS

KIA MOTORS INC. A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

YU MICHAEL C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LEHRMAN KATE

TALLENT ERIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

8/16/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/9/2019: Minute Order

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/7/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/7/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/7/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/7/2019: Answer

Answer

1/29/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

11/26/2018: Summons

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alfonso Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alfonso Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KIA Motors, Inc., a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alfonso Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alfonso Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alfonso Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alfonso Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA KIA OF CERRITOS is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YU MICHAEL CALING

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER