This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 00:19:01 (UTC).

ALFONSO ARANDA FLORES, ET AL. VS G AND E HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC DBA ASTORIA NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 ALFONSO ARANDA FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against G AND E HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC DBA ASTORIA NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, STEPHEN P. PFAHLER, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6499

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORES JR. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALFONSO ARANDA FLORES ALFONSO

FLORES BY AND THROUGH ALFONSO FLORES JR AS PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALFONSO ARANDA FLORES ALFONSO ARANDA

Defendants

SAINT CABRINI HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

G AND E HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC DBA ASTORIA NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VALENTINE KIMBERLY

VALENTINE KIMBERLY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN M ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET FOR HEARING...)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET FOR HEARING...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC

4/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO RE...)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO RE...)

Opposition - DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARA TE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET

10/24/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARA TE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET

Opposition - DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEP ARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL

10/25/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEP ARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL

10/28/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT

10/28/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO RE...) OF 10/29/2019

10/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO RE...) OF 10/29/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO SP...)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO SP...)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/4/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/4/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

8/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Separate Statement

8/14/2019: Separate Statement

Case Management Statement

6/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MTS PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

5/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MTS PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

3/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice (of continued hearing for OSC re Dismissal); Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Jury Trial (10 Days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alfonso Aranda Flores, by and through Alfonso Flores Jr, as Personal Represenative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff); Alfonso Flores Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alfonso Aranda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G AND E HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAINT CABRINI HEALTHCARE SERVICES,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENTINE KIMBERLY