This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 09:27:11 (UTC).

ALFONSO AMADOR RENDON VS GALPIN MOTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 ALFONSO AMADOR RENDON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GALPIN MOTORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4570

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON ALFONSO AMADOR

Defendant

GALPIN MOTORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/2/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/2/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/2/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/2/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

3/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

3/17/2023: Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketAddress for Edgar Manukyan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Galpin Motors, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation to Galpin Motors, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Edgar Manukyan (Attorney) clerical correction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less