This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 22:49:16 (UTC).

ALFONSO AMADOR RENDON VS GALPIN MOTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 ALFONSO AMADOR RENDON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GALPIN MOTORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4570

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON ALFONSO AMADOR

Defendant

GALPIN MOTORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN EDGAR

Defendant Attorney

OKELBERRY NATHAN V.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/2/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/2/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/2/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/2/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

3/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

3/17/2023: Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5/18/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/5/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2024
  • Hearing08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc. (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 10/16/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Edgar Manukyan (Attorney) clerical correction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alfonso Amador Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Motors, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less