This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 14:37:03 (UTC).

ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES, ET AL. VS WITMER MANOR PARTNERS LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WITMER MANOR PARTNERS LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1921

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINGUES ALEXSANDREA

Defendants

WITMER MANOR PARTNERS LP

ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OPIA ENWEMUCHE KINGSLEY

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN IGHEGHA

Defendant Attorney

HALM DAVID G.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

2/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

1/26/2023: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Substitution of Attorney

1/10/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/30/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ISAIAH COSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALPH PROPERTY MANAGEMENTS MEM DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ISAIAH COSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALPH PROPERTY MANAGEMENTS MEM DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion re: - MOTION RE: DEFENDANT ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: DEFENDANT ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM DEFENDANT ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM DEFENDANT ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ISAIAH COSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ISAIAH COSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/22/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/19/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/7/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Hearing02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: WITMER MANOR PARTNERS LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alpha Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketMotion re: Defendant Alpha Property Management's Notice of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Alpha Property Management (Defendant); As to: ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Isaiah Costas in Support of Defendant Alpha Property Managment's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Alpha Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketMemorandum Defendant Alpha Property Management's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's amended Complaint; Filed by: Alpha Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Alpha Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Alpha Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Armani: Filed By: ARMANI J MCGREW (Plaintiff),ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ARMANI J MCGREW (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES (Plaintiff); ARMANI J MCGREW (Plaintiff); As to: WITMER MANOR PARTNERS LP (Defendant); ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (A Corporation Of Unknown Origin) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES (Plaintiff); ARMANI J MCGREW (Plaintiff); As to: WITMER MANOR PARTNERS LP (Defendant); ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (A Corporation Of Unknown Origin) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ARMANI J MCGREW (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ALEXSANDREA DOMINGUES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WITMER MANOR PARTNERS L.P is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALM DAVID