This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2019 at 01:35:02 (UTC).

ALEXIS HOOKS VS VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 ALEXIS HOOKS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3297

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOOKS ALEXIS

Defendant

VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. DBA PROGRESSIVE HEALTH CARE DBA VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOULARTE DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

7/23/2019: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/23/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order

7/18/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

7/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/17/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

4/17/2019: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexis Hooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less