This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2022 at 20:57:58 (UTC).

ALEXIS CARDOZA, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT VS BHFC OPERATING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 ALEXIS CARDOZA, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BHFC OPERATING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4040

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALEXIS CARDOZA INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT

ALEXIS CARDOZA

Defendants

BHFC OPERATING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BHFC OPERATING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENISH JONATHAN M.

Defendant Attorney

VEGLIA ALICIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/8/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

3/1/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/28/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2022

2/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2022

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

2/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/28/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

1/6/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BHFC Operating LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ALEXIS CARDOZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 2:16 PM in Department 58; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/24/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Unavailability); Filed by BHFC Operating LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by ALEXIS CARDOZA, individually, and on behalf of Aggrieved Employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by BHFC Operating LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ALEXIS CARDOZA, individually, and on behalf of Aggrieved Employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALEXIS CARDOZA, individually, and on behalf of Aggrieved Employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALEXIS CARDOZA, individually, and on behalf of Aggrieved Employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALEXIS CARDOZA, individually, and on behalf of Aggrieved Employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BHFC OPERATING LLC DBA "BOTTEGA LOUIE" A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ORGANIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VEGLIA ALICIA