Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 17:00:25 (UTC).

ALEXIS AGAR-VALENCIA VS PSL ASSOCIATES LLC.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 ALEXIS AGAR-VALENCIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PSL ASSOCIATES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1548

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGAR-VALENCIA ALEXIS

Defendants

PSL ASSOCIATES LLC.

PSL ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG SAMUEL ALAN

Defendant Attorney

BOYCE SHANNON R.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE REMOVAL

6/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE REMOVAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

5/24/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

5/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 04/12/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 04/12/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

4/12/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re Removal); Filed by PSL Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 4:09 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by PSL Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PSL Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Alexis Agar-Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 11:19 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 04/12/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alexis Agar-Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexis Agar-Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYCE SHANNON R.