Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 06:38:20 (UTC).

ALEXANDRA HEREDIA VS ROYELLE, LLC DBA VISTING ANGELS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 ALEXANDRA HEREDIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROYELLE, LLC DBA VISTING ANGELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9486

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEREDIA ALEXANDRA

HEREDIA ALEXANDRA INDACO

Defendants

BLACK MIRIAM

BLACK ALETHEA

ROYELLE LLC DBA VISTING ANGELS

ROYELLE LLC DBA "VISITING ANGELS"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STUBBE RYAN A.

JAURIGUE MICHAEL JOE

SHAHABI SHAHAB SEAN

YOUNG STEPHEN CRAIG

SHERMAN RICHARD LLOYD

SHERMAN RICHARD LLOYD ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS WHITNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Answer

6/23/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/23/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;) OF 06/23/2021

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;) OF 06/23/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/12/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Substitution of Attorney

3/4/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/31/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • Hearing08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 3:57 PM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge;) of 06/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Royelle, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Royelle, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Further Case Management Conference); Filed by Alexandra Indaco Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Alexandra Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alexandra Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Alexandra Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alexandra Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alexandra Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexandra Heredia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG STEPHEN CRAIG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHABI SHAHAB SEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUBBE RYAN A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERMAN RICHARD LLOYD