Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2021 at 17:01:32 (UTC).

ALEXANDRA HARRISON, ET AL. VS STEVEN RUTHS, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 ALEXANDRA HARRISON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against STEVEN RUTHS, M D . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8826

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRISON CLAIRE INDIVIDUALLY

HARRISON PETER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL HARRISON DECEASED

HARRISON ALEXANDRA

Defendants

RUTHS M.D. STEVEN M.

AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISENBERG LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/22/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/15/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alexandra Harrison (Plaintiff); Peter Harrison, , Individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Michael Harrison, Deceased (Plaintiff); Claire Harrison, , Individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alexandra Harrison (Plaintiff); Peter Harrison, , Individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Michael Harrison, Deceased (Plaintiff); Claire Harrison, , Individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alexandra Harrison (Plaintiff); Peter Harrison, , Individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Michael Harrison, Deceased (Plaintiff); Claire Harrison, , Individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alexandra Harrison (Plaintiff); Peter Harrison, , Individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Michael Harrison, Deceased (Plaintiff); Claire Harrison, , Individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexandra Harrison (Plaintiff); Peter Harrison, , Individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Michael Harrison, Deceased (Plaintiff); Claire Harrison, , Individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant