Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 00:56:39 (UTC).

ALEXANDRA DATIG VS LIVINSTONE LA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 ALEXANDRA DATIG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVINSTONE LA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4781

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DATIG ALEXANDRA

Defendants

AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES

SCHINDLER ELEVATOR CORPORATION

CALIBER ELEVATOR CORPORATION

LIVINGSTONE LA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERLSTEIN JOHN J

Defendant Attorneys

MELKONIAN GEOFFREY

INAMINE BRIAN SEISHIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

8/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/16/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/30/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

9/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/30/2019: Answer

Answer

10/7/2019: Answer

Request for Dismissal

8/9/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/24/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/15/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Hearing05/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by ALEXANDRA DATIG (Plaintiff); LIVINGSTONE LA, LLC (Defendant); CALIBER ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Address); Filed by LIVINGSTONE LA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by JOHN J PERLSTEIN (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CALIBER ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LIVINGSTONE LA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALEXANDRA DATIG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Filed by ALEXANDRA DATIG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALEXANDRA DATIG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALEXANDRA DATIG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALEXANDRA DATIG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIBER ELEVATOR CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Schindler Elevator Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERLSTEIN JOHN J