This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2022 at 08:53:28 (UTC).

ALEXANDER WU, ET AL. VS KHALED A. TAWANSY, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ALEXANDER WU, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KHALED A TAWANSY, M D ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4808

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WU DI

Defendants

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

TAWANSY KHALED A. M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEARS CHRISTOPHER BYRON

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/1/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/21/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALEXANDER

11/21/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALEXANDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 11/16/2022 to 11/21/2022; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Alexander; Filed by: Alexander Wu (Plaintiff); Di Wu (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexander Wu (Plaintiff); Di Wu (Plaintiff); As to: Khaled A. Tawansy, M.D. (Defendant); San Gabriel Valley Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexander Wu (Plaintiff); Di Wu (Plaintiff); As to: Khaled A. Tawansy, M.D. (Defendant); San Gabriel Valley Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEARS, CHRISTOPHER B