This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 14:10:08 (UTC).

ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY VS SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0562

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSHANSKY ALEXANDER

Defendants

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC

CHEBAN MIKHAIL

AIRSTAR HVAC INC.

STAROSELSKIY VLADIMIR

STAR VLADIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREITER BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/5/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/27/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC is a litigant