This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 15:16:10 (UTC).

ALEXANDER MORADI, ET AL. VS LYONS DEVELOPMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 ALEXANDER MORADI filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LYONS DEVELOPMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9233

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER MORADI AS TRUSTEE OF THE ALEXANDER MORADI TRUST

MORADI ALEXANDER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LYONS MATTHEW PATRICK

LYONS DEVELOPMENT INC.

KEROS NICHOLAS

THRASHER NK LLC

ROMAN JAMES DESIGN BUILD INC.

JAMES ROMAN

COLOMBO LUCA

PRECISION BUILDERS INCORPORATED A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ROMAN JAMES DESIGN BUILD INC.

JAMES ROMAN

COLOMBO LUCA

PRECISION BUILDERS INCORPORATED A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Defendants

LYONS DEVELOPMENT INC.

THRASHER NK LLC

ROMAN JAMES DESIGN BUILD INC.

PRECISION BUILDERS INCORPORATED A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

MOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGUYEN BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

WALLACH JASON

NANGANO MICHAEL A.J.

JEFFERY MONA J.

DRESIE LEE A.

Cross Defendant Attorney

MADARIAGA DAVID BERRY

Other Attorneys

NOVIAN FARHAD

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

8/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

7/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Case Management Statement

7/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

7/22/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY AND DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

7/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY AND DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Application for Publication

7/23/2021: Application for Publication

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ALEXANDER MORADIS AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

7/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ALEXANDER MORADIS AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roman James Design Build, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Precision Builders Incorporated, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Precision Builders Incorporated, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Precision Builders Incorporated, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Precision Builders Incorporated, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luca Colombo (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff); Alexander Moradi as trustee of The Alexander Moradi Trust, dated June 21, 2000, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff); Alexander Moradi as trustee of The Alexander Moradi Trust, dated June 21, 2000, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff); Alexander Moradi as trustee of The Alexander Moradi Trust, dated June 21, 2000, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff); Alexander Moradi as trustee of The Alexander Moradi Trust, dated June 21, 2000, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexander Moradi (Plaintiff); Alexander Moradi as trustee of The Alexander Moradi Trust, dated June 21, 2000, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRECISION BUILDERS INCORPORATED A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LYONS DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THRASHER NK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROMAN JAMES DESIGN BUILD INC. is a litigant