This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 07:50:17 (UTC).

ALEXANDER LU VS RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 ALEXANDER LU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6657

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LU ALEXANDER

LU AN INDIVIDUAL ALEXANDER

Defendants

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

BANK OF AMERICA NAITONAL ASSOCIATION A UNITED STATES CORPORATION

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A UNITED STATES CORPORATION

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMINTED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VOKSHORI LAW GROUP

VOKSHORI NIMA STEPHEN

Defendant Attorneys

COUTTS MELISSA ROBBINS

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS LLP

BRITT STEPHEN

ABBOTT THOMAS NATHANIEL

BIDERMAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/9/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/09/2020

10/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/09/2020

Request for Dismissal

2/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/23/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

12/23/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO BANK OF AMERICA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MOTION TO STRIKE

12/9/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO BANK OF AMERICA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT ...)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT ...)

Notice of Ruling

12/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. COPLAN RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO BANA'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. COPLAN RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO BANA'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Declaration - DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E; Jury Trial ((Estimate5 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department E; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALEXANDER LU, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department E; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department E; Jury Trial ((Estimate5 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department E; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNotice (of OSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6657    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: E

DEMURRER

[CCP ;430.10 et. seq.]

Case: Alexander Lu v. Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC (EC 066657)

Defendant Bank of America, N.A.’s (“BANA”) Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Second Amended Complaint (“SAC”) is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.

The Court has reluctantly considered plaintiff’s late-filed “Supplemental Opposition,” which was filed without leave of Court and after the demurrer had been fully briefed. Indeed, plaintiff made the strategic decision simply to oppose the demurrer initially on the ground that BANA’s brief was over the page limit set forth in CRC Rule 3.1113(d). Ultimately acknowledging the folly of that position one day before the initially scheduled hearing on the demurrer (see 12/5/19 Coplan Decl.), plaintiff thereafter filed the Supplemental Opposition merely three days before the instant hearing, leaving virtually no time for BANA to submit a reply. Plaintiff is hereby warned that, in the future, the Court may decline to consider filings not made in accordance with the rules and statutes that govern this litigation.

On the merits, the Court finds that the new allegations of the SAC fail to sufficiently correct the deficiencies previously noted in this Court’s August 16, 2019 minute order sustaining the demurrer to the First Amended Complaint (“FAC”), including the bar of the statute of limitations, as well as the judicial estoppel and res judicata bars flowing from plaintiff’s bankruptcy, bankruptcy proceedings and filings, and bankruptcy discharge. The SAC’s new allegations concerning a scheme pursuant to which BANA is sought to be held responsible for Rushmore’s conduct from 2016 onward (after BANA is alleged to have transferred all interest in the Note, Deed of Trust and subject property to MTGLQ Investors LP, as is expressly permitted under the DOT), are insufficient to create BANA’s vicarious responsibility for those co-defendants’ alleged wrongdoing. In this regard, it is noteworthy that the purportedly conspiratorial act in which BANA is alleged to have engaged, namely, “with[olding] the terms of the Loan Modification Agreement from MTLGQ/RUSHMORE” (SAC ¶ 37) is flatly inconsistent with conspiring with or knowingly aiding and abetting those entities to harm plaintiff.

Because plaintiff has failed in the SAC to correct the deficiencies of the FAC, despite being permitted to do so, and because plaintiff has failed in his Supplemental Opposition to meet the burden of demonstrating how the SAC could be amended to cure it of the repeated defects, the demurrer is now sustained without leave to amend.

Defendant BANA’s Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED in part. The Court has taken judicial notice of the existence of the subject documents in the Court file, but not the truth of hearsay allegations contained therein, except in connection with certain exceptions as enumerated in Day v. Sharp (1975) 50 Cal.App.3d 904, 914, including the effect of Court orders. The Court has considered the absence of material in the documents to the extent permissible in connection with arguments that inconsistent positions have been taken and judicial estoppel may apply.

Defendant BANA shall submit an appropriate proposed order of dismissal.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTGLQ Investors, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant