This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 09:55:04 (UTC).

ALEXANDER JOHNSON VS THE BURBANK HOTEL LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 ALEXANDER JOHNSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE BURBANK HOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4464

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JOHNSON ALEXANDER

Respondents and Defendants

THE BURBANK HOTEL LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

BURBANK HOTEL LLC THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BAUTISTA RUMMEL MOR LAW OFFICES OF

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

GIGLIOTTI JOSEPH J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

11/16/2017: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/21/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

10/5/2017: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/4/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

6/9/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

SUMMONS -

6/9/2017: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/24/2017: VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/12/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/15/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; Status Conference (Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Burbank Hotel, LLC, The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Alexander Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexander Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BURBANK HOTEL LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIGLIOTTI JOSEPH J