This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 18:28:14 (UTC).

ALEXANDER J. HASHTROUDI VS NICHOLAS SABER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 ALEXANDER J HASHTROUDI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NICHOLAS SABER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0694

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASHTROUDI ALEXANDER J.

Defendants

AZIMI LILI HAJ AKA LILI AZIMI

RESHAD NAGHMEH

SABER ALEXANDER

SABER DAVID

SABER NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

Defendant Attorney

RANDHAWA AMTOJ

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE

10/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

11/4/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH FERRENTINO

11/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH FERRENTINO

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID SABER

11/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID SABER

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NAGMEH RESHAD

11/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NAGMEH RESHAD

Exhibit List

11/4/2021: Exhibit List

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/4/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/4/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Lis Pendens

10/7/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Lis Pendens

10/7/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/31/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

9/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

Notice - NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

9/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

8/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DAVID SABER); Filed by David Saber (Defendant); Naghmeh Reshad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JOSEPH FERRENTINO); Filed by David Saber (Defendant); Naghmeh Reshad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by David Saber (Defendant); Naghmeh Reshad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by David Saber (Defendant); Naghmeh Reshad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF NAGMEH RESHAD); Filed by David Saber (Defendant); Naghmeh Reshad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment and Proof of Service); Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Statement of Damages); Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (Amended); Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)); Filed by Alexander J. Hashtroudi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS