This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2018 at 05:51:03 (UTC).

ALEXANDER CHOI ET AL VS CAH 2014 1 BORROWER, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 ALEXANDER CHOI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAH 2014 1 BORROWER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4339

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TABORA LYDIA

CHOI ALEXANDER

Defendants and Respondents

WAYPOINT HOMES

DOES 1 TO 20

CAH 2014-1 BORROWER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOI ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE: 1. VIOLATION OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

9/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE: 1. VIOLATION OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/7/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/19/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/19/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

9/1/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less