Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 02:15:54 (UTC).

ALEX TAMOYKIN, ET AL. VS ROSA MEJIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 ALEX TAMOYKIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROSA MEJIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4607

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CREED CHRIS

TAMOYKIN ALEX

Defendants

MEJIA ROSA

REALTY MASTERS & ASSOCIATES I

ABELLO AS AN AGENT RAFAEL

ABELLO RAFAEL

REALTY MASTERS & ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEANG EVIE PEI

JEANG EVIE P.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

6/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

6/12/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/13/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

3/12/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

3/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/18/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice

11/28/2018: Notice

Summons

11/13/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/13/2018: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Case Management Conference) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Ca...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Ca...) of 06/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Case Management Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Ca...) of 05/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Appear at Ca...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 03/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alex Tamoykin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alex Tamoykin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alex Tamoykin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice (of Pendency of Action); Filed by Alex Tamoykin (Plaintiff); Chris Creed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alex Tamoykin (Plaintiff); Chris Creed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Alex Tamoykin (Plaintiff); Chris Creed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY MASTERS & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEANG EVIE PEI