This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 11:51:03 (UTC).

ALEX KHADAVI VS FINANCE CALIFORNIA INC.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 ALEX KHADAVI filed an Other lawsuit against FINANCE CALIFORNIA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0391

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KHADAVI ALEX

Respondent

FINANCE CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASPARI WILLIAM S

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE)

11/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

11/9/2020: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION TO APPOINT JUDICIAL REFEREE

11/9/2020: Petition - PETITION TO APPOINT JUDICIAL REFEREE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPOINT JUDICIAL REFEREE

11/9/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPOINT JUDICIAL REFEREE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER APPOINTING JUDICIAL REFEREE

11/12/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER APPOINTING JUDICIAL REFEREE

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING BOND

11/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING BOND

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER RELEASING SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER]

6/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER RELEASING SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER]

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER RELEASING SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

6/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER RELEASING SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASE OF SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

6/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASE OF SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 06/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

Notice of Settlement

6/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal and Order Releasing Security for Temporary Restraining Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (and Order Releasing Security for Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Release of Security for Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...) of 06/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Posting Bond); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Appointment of Referee) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Referee)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order Appointing Judicial Referee); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPetition (To Appoint Judicial Referee); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (To Appoint Judicial Referee); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Alex Khadavi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCE CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caspari, William S.