This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 00:09:21 (UTC).

ALEX GAMBOA VS ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 ALEX GAMBOA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7429

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAMBOA ALEX

Defendant

ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE INC. DBA GOLDEN ROAD BREWERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASHIMA TRENTON ROSS

KASHIMA TRENTON R.

Defendant Attorney

GAUT KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/14/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

4/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2020

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

1/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/17/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order - ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ROBERT E. DEROSE

12/5/2019: Order - ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ROBERT E. DEROSE

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

12/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED ...)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE

12/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/22/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

11/22/2019: Answer

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 3:19 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only); Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alex Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kashima, Trenton R