This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 00:21:24 (UTC).

ALEX FURTADO, , ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS BAMIA 2, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ALEX FURTADO, , ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BAMIA 2, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7585

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FURTADO ALEX ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

FURTADO ALEX

Defendants

BAMIA 2 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REEF GLOBAL INC. A CORPORATE FORM UNKNOWN

REEF TECHNOLOGY INC. A CORPORATE FORM UNKNOWN

BAMIA 2 LLC

REEF GLOBAL INC.

REEF TECHNOLOGY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YADIDSION DANNY

Defendant Attorney

FARBER MIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT REEF GLOBAL, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF ALEX FURTADO'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT REEF GLOBAL, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF ALEX FURTADO'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDA...)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDA...) OF 11/30/2021

11/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: APPLICATION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDA...) OF 11/30/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

2/9/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES FOR AL...) OF 02/09/2022

2/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES FOR AL...) OF 02/09/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES FOR AL...)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES FOR AL...)

Case Management Statement

1/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/10/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation for Consolidation of Cases for Al...) of 02/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation for Consolidation of Cases for Al...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Consolidation of Cases for All Purposes and [Proposed] Order Thereon; Filed by Reef Global, Inc. (Defendant); Bamia 2, LLC (Defendant); Reef Technology, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bamia 2, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bamia 2, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:45 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application and Stipulation to Extend Defenda...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketApplication and Stipulation to Extend Defendant Reef Global, Inc.'s time to respond to Plaintiff Alex Furtado's Complaint; [Proposed] Order; Filed by Reef Technology, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Application and Stipulation to Extend Defenda...) of 11/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alex Furtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alex Furtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alex Furtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alex Furtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAMIA 2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REEF GLOBAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where REEF TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARBER MIA