Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 09:41:04 (UTC).

ALEX CONTRERAS VS ABSOLUTE SECURITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 ALEX CONTRERAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABSOLUTE SECURITY INTERNATIONAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4802

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRERAS ALEX

Defendants

ABSOLUTE SECURITY INTERNATIONAL INC.

LIN LUCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES BLAKE

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/15/2021

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/21/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

8/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/03/2020

8/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/03/2020

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLIN AGREEMENT OF DEFENDANT LUCY LIN

7/16/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLIN AGREEMENT OF DEFENDANT LUCY LIN

Notice of Related Case

7/28/2020: Notice of Related Case

Order - ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

7/2/2020: Order - ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice of Appearance

6/26/2020: Notice of Appearance

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ELECTRONIC SERVICE) OF 06/19/2020

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ELECTRONIC SERVICE) OF 06/19/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ELECTRONIC SERVICE)

6/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ELECTRONIC SERVICE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

4/16/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

5/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Dismissal Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.770) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 2:36 PM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alex Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:42 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alex Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alex Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 05/19/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alex Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alex Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY BARRY ALAN