This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 07:07:33 (UTC).

ALEN TRUONG VS TRAN HIEN THUC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 ALEN TRUONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRAN HIEN THUC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0323

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUONG ALEN

Defendant

THUC TRAN HIEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE DAVID H.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/16/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/16/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/20/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/12/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/15/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alen Truong (Plaintiff); As to: Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/20/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Alen Truong (Plaintiff); As to: Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Tran Hien Thuc; On the Complaint filed by Alen Truong on 09/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant) to Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 12/15/2022 to 12/15/2022 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Alen Truong (Plaintiff); As to: Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Tran Hien Thuc; On the Complaint filed by Alen Truong on 09/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketAddress for David H. Pierce (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alen Truong (Plaintiff); As to: Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alen Truong (Plaintiff); As to: Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alen Truong (Plaintiff); As to: Tran Hien Thuc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIERCE DAVID HOWARD