This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 12:05:33 (UTC).

ALEMAN, LAURA GABRIEL VS ORTIZ, JUAN MANUEL ALFARO

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 ALEMAN, LAURA GABRIEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ORTIZ, JUAN MANUEL ALFARO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOUNG, PATRICIA A. and WARREN, JEANMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6708

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOUNG, PATRICIA A.

WARREN, JEANMARIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEMAN LAURA GABRIEL

Respondent

ORTIZ JUAN MANUEL ALFARO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SHAFER ROGER STUART

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

12/2/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

12/2/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

12/2/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

12/2/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/2/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

12/22/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/10/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 13, Young, Patricia A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 13, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFER ROGER STUART