This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 16:09:25 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO TORRES VS JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 ALEJANDRO TORRES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0939

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES ALEJANDRO

Defendants

DOE MANUEL

DOE RODOLFO

JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NAVA NESTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JACE HYUN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alejandro Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alejandro Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alejandro Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandro Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JACE H. ESQ.