This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 02:28:23 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO REYES VS MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 ALEJANDRO REYES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3709

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REYES ALEJANDRO

Defendants and Respondents

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

DOES 1-75

MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC.

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSNER HALLEN D.

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

10/9/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

11/5/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/20/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE I78O(D)

10/2/2018: PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE I78O(D)

PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES (CODE OF CIV. PROC. 425.115)

10/2/2018: PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES (CODE OF CIV. PROC. 425.115)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT

10/2/2018: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

10/2/2018: SUMMONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • at 08:39 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • at 08:38 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/15/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Alejandro Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES (CODE OF CIV. PROC. 425.115)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE I78O(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIRANDA'S AUTO is a litigant

Latest cases where CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSNER HALLEN D. ESQ.