This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:32:01 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO JIMENEZ VS PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/17/2017 ALEJANDRO JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PREMIER MEAT COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7416

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JIMENEZ ALEJANDRO

Claimant

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

AG AZZAR

HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KHORSHIDI OMID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

REINHOLTZ JACK RUSSELL ESQ.

Other Attorneys

JOHNSEN GREGORY FRANCIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/26/2017: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/31/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/31/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/31/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

4/2/2018: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/18/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S, HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION, ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LAUREN S. GAFA, ESQ. [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S, HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION, ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LAUREN S. GAFA, ESQ. [PROPOSED] ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S, HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION, ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF RULING TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S, HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION, ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF LAUREN S. GAFA; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/14/2018: DEFENDANT HOLLYMATIC CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF LAUREN S. GAFA; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order

10/1/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/1/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF RULING RE:DEFENDANT HOLLYMATIC CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE:DEFENDANT HOLLYMATIC CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Ex Parte Application

3/28/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/28/2019: Minute Order

Motion to Continue Trial Date

4/4/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Summons

4/23/2019: Summons

Notice

5/1/2019: Notice

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for Plaintiff); Filed by Alejandro Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • First Amended Summons; Filed by Alejandro Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all trial-related dates) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and all tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (Re: Defendant Hollymatic Corporation's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial); Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Hollymatic Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Alejandro Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Alejandro Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Alejandro Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Alejandro Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC657416    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On April 17, 2017, Plaintiff Alejandro Jimenez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Premier Meat Company for negligence, strict products liability, breach of warranty, violation of Labor Code section 4558, loss of consortium, intentional interference with prospective civil action by spoliation of evidence, and negligent interference with prospective civil action by spoliation of evidence arising out of an April 17, 2015 work-related meat grinder incident where three of Plaintiff’s fingers were amputated. Defendants Hollymatic Corporation and Azzar AG (sued as Doe 1 and Doe 2, collectively “Defendants”) move to continue the trial date from January 21, 2020 to May 2020. This unopposed motion was filed on September 25, 2019 and is made on the following grounds: (1) defendant Azzar AG has not yet been able to engage in meaningful discovery as it filed an answer in the case on June 14, 2019; (2) Azzar AG is a company based in Switzerland, and discovery is unlikely to be completed by the discovery cut-off date, December 22, 2019; (3) Plaintiff’s counsel has been unavailable and half of the ten depositions scheduled have been unable to go forward; (4) an associate in defense counsel’s office recently left and a new attorney has joined the case and needs time to become familiar with the case; (5) Plaintiff’s independent medical exam is scheduled for September 26, and a deposition of the examiner is anticipated. Trial has been continued twice in this case already.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Based on the above, the Court finds good cause exists to continue the trial date in this action. The new trial date is May 14, 2020 and the new date for the final status conference is April 30, 2020. All discovery/motion cut-off dates to be based on the new trial date.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.