This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 00:17:29 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO GARCIA VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 ALEJANDRO GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4168

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GARCIA ALEJANDRO

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1-30

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Cross Defendants

GASCA ADRIANA

GASCA DANNY R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FINKEL JAKE D. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PETERS THOMAS HARRY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

10/3/2018: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/3/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

10/3/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

Answer

10/31/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/31/2018: Cross-Complaint

Other - - Cross-Complaint Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

11/1/2018: Other - - Cross-Complaint Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

Summons - Summons Cross-Complaint

11/1/2018: Summons - Summons Cross-Complaint

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2/20/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/6/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/30/2020

6/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

3/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING FIRST FEES

3/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING FIRST FEES

Request for Dismissal

3/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alejandro Garcia (Plaintiff); City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Posting first Fees); Filed by Alejandro Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:27 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandro Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERS THOMAS HARRY