This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:36:51 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO CASAREZ VS KIA MOTORS AMERICA, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 ALEJANDRO CASAREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIA MOTORS AMERICA, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1980

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASAREZ ALEJANDRO

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

KIA MOTORS AMERICA A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORROW NEAL F.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/8/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/8/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 11:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALEJANDRO CASAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALEJANDRO CASAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALEJANDRO CASAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORROW NEAL F.