This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 05:49:34 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO BANUELOS VS PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE LLC

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 ALEJANDRO BANUELOS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7301

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANUELOS ALEJANDRO

Defendant

PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZAT MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

MCCREARY DUNCAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

9/9/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Alejandro Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alejandro Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alejandro Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alejandro Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alejandro Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandro Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCREARY DUNCAN