This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 20:57:04 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA TORO, ET AL. VS NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 ALEJANDRA TORO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9618

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAUCIN FRANCISCO A.

TORO ALEJANDRA

Defendants

NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEFFLER DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/16/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/16/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alejandra Toro (Plaintiff); Francisco A. Gaucin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alejandra Toro (Plaintiff); Francisco A. Gaucin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandra Toro (Plaintiff); Francisco A. Gaucin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOEFFLER DAVID ROBERT