This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2022 at 08:07:57 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA RAMIREZ, ET AL. VS KEESE DE LA CROIX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 ALEJANDRA RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KEESE DE LA CROIX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL FEENEY, DAVID J. COWAN, GARY Y. TANAKA and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4946

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JILL FEENEY

DAVID J. COWAN

GARY Y. TANAKA

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ ALEJANDRA

RAMIREZ OCTAVIO

Defendants

BARGHI KASRA

DE LA CROIX KEESE

DE LA CROIX QUINN AKA QUINN MAURICE CROIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSTAMI ARPA

AIVAZI ZHANA

Defendant Attorney

LONG H. G.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

8/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/17/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/17/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Notice of Related Case

7/18/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA FOR DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

6/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA FOR DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT]

6/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT]

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/13/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT]

5/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT]

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/16/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/18/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRA RAMIREZ

2/18/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRA RAMIREZ

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/28/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/30/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice

2/9/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RE: 22STCV04940 (LEAD CASE PENDING IN DEPT. 31 AND 22STCV04946) - DEPT 31 TO RULE

2/9/2022: Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RE: 22STCV04940 (LEAD CASE PENDING IN DEPT. 31 AND 22STCV04946) - DEPT 31 TO RULE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REVIEW AN...) OF 02/15/2022

2/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REVIEW AN...) OF 02/15/2022

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default; Filed by Alejandra Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Docketat 2:08 PM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Alejandra Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Request for Entry of Default / Judgment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Errata for Defendants' Demurrer; Filed by Keese De La Croix (Defendant); Quinn De La Croix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Request for Entry of Default / Judgment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandra Ramirez (Plaintiff); Octavio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alejandra Ramirez (Plaintiff); Octavio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Re: 22STCV04940 (Lead case Pending in Dept. 31 and 22STCV04946) - DEPT 31 TO RULE); Filed by Octavio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Alejandra Ramirez (Plaintiff); Octavio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alejandra Ramirez (Plaintiff); Octavio Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSTAMI ARPA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIVAZI ZHANA